NY S08129 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.6837
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.6837
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Suspends hydraulic fracturing for the extraction of natural gas or oil until May 15, 2011; suspends the issuance of new permits for such drilling.
Title
Suspends hydraulic fracturing for the extraction of natural gas or oil until May 15, 2011; suspends the issuance of new permits for such drilling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 43 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-13 | VETOED MEMO.6837 | |
2010-12-01 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-11-29 | returned to senate | |
2010-11-29 | passed assembly | |
2010-11-29 | ordered to third reading rules cal.579 | |
2010-11-29 | substituted for a11443b | |
2010-08-04 | referred to ways and means | |
2010-08-03 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-08-03 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-08-03 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1429 | |
2010-06-18 | PRINT NUMBER 8129B | |
2010-06-18 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES | |
2010-06-17 | PRINT NUMBER 8129A | |
2010-06-17 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES | |
2010-06-14 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-06-10 | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A11443 (Same As) 2010-11-29 - substituted by s8129b