NY S08125 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Chabad at Stony Brook, Inc. to submit a retroactive application for a real property tax exemption to the assessor of town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, for a parcel at 22 Sturrock Way.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Chabad at Stony Brook, Inc. to submit a retroactive application for a real property tax exemption to the assessor of town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, for a parcel at 22 Sturrock Way.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-05SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A10130
2018-05-31SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-30Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1347
2018-05-15SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-04-06SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A10130 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.150

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback