NY S08124 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - PRINT NUMBER 8124B
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - PRINT NUMBER 8124B
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires travel insurance companies to provide refunds for travel cancelled due to coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19).
Title
Requires travel insurance companies to provide refunds for travel cancelled due to coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8124B |
2020-05-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8124A |
2020-05-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A10542 (Same As) 2020-05-28 - referred to insurance