NY S08123 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - PRINT NUMBER 8123B
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - PRINT NUMBER 8123B
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits any uninsured individual to receive free coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19) testing; such information shall be afforded confidentiality protection.
Title
Permits any uninsured individual to receive free coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19) testing; such information shall be afforded confidentiality protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8123B |
2020-07-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8123A |
2020-05-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10494 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES