NY S08113 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.108
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.108
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to issuing a moratorium on utility termination of services during periods of pandemics and/or state of emergencies.
Title
Relates to issuing a moratorium on utility termination of services during periods of pandemics and/or state of emergencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.108 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.54 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | substituted for a10521 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-05-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.641 |
2020-05-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8113A |
2020-05-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-05-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10521 (Same As) 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.108