NY S08107 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to excused leave to undertake a screening for prostate cancer.
Title
Relates to excused leave to undertake a screening for prostate cancer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.96 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.29 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a409b |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2016-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1886 |
2016-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00409 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s8107