NY S08102 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - SIGNED CHAP.519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to employment agencies, including application for license; relates to procedures; relates to granting of licenses and enforcement of provisions relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to employment agencies, including application for license; relates to procedures; relates to granting of licenses and enforcement of provisions relating thereto.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-31AssemblySIGNED CHAP.519
2016-12-31AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.35
2016-12-20SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2016-06-16Assemblyreturned to senate
2016-06-16Assemblypassed assembly
2016-06-16Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.474
2016-06-16Assemblysubstituted for a10672
2016-06-16Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2016-06-16SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2016-06-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2016-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1751
2016-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A10672 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s8102

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback