NY S08095 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.388
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.388
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the eligibility of J-51 tax abatements to reflect cost-of-living adjustments.
Title
Relates to the eligibility of J-51 tax abatements to reflect cost-of-living adjustments.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.388 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.509 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a10651 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1750 |
2016-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10651 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s8095