NY S08093 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Fire Island Pines fire department to adopt a resolution to hold future meetings, for nomination of chief and assistant chiefs, on the first Saturday following Labor day.
Title
Permits the Fire Island Pines fire department to adopt a resolution to hold future meetings, for nomination of chief and assistant chiefs, on the first Saturday following Labor day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.732 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10816 (Same As) 2020-07-15 - referred to local governments