NY S08092 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the terms and conditions of employment for members of the collective negotiating unit consisting of investigators, senior investigators, and investigative specialists in the division of state police; implements an agreement covering such members of such unit; amends salary schedules for such members of such unit; relates to the employee benefit fund for members of such unit; makes an appropriation therefor; and repeals certain provisions of such laws relating thereto.
Title
Relates to the terms and conditions of employment for members of the collective negotiating unit consisting of investigators, senior investigators, and investigative specialists in the division of state police; implements an agreement covering such members of such unit; amends salary schedules for such members of such unit; relates to the employee benefit fund for members of such unit; makes an appropriation therefor; and repeals certain provisions of such laws relating thereto.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.234 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.476 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a10682 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1804 |
2016-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10682 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s8092