NY S08087 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the widow of Gerald J. Sullivan to file an application with the New York state and local police and fire retirement system on behalf of such deceased member and deem such application as timely filed.
Title
Authorizes the widow of Gerald J. Sullivan to file an application with the New York state and local police and fire retirement system on behalf of such deceased member and deem such application as timely filed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2022-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1367 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09630 (Same As) 2022-03-28 - referred to governmental employees