NY S08083 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that no person operating or controlling any Class I railroad or Class II railroad shall allow the operation of any railroad train or locomotive for the movement of hazardous materials unless such railroad train or locomotive has a crew of not less than two individuals.
Title
Provides that no person operating or controlling any Class I railroad or Class II railroad shall allow the operation of any railroad train or locomotive for the movement of hazardous materials unless such railroad train or locomotive has a crew of not less than two individuals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8491 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.199 |
2024-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08491 (Same As) 2024-02-13 - signed chap.79