NY S08075 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes spent fuel that is pending further or final disposal from a nuclear power station following the permanent cessation of power of operations of such station within the definition of real property.
Title
Includes spent fuel that is pending further or final disposal from a nuclear power station following the permanent cessation of power of operations of such station within the definition of real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.74 |
2020-12-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.385 |
2020-12-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.124 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a10398 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.730 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10398 (Same As) 2020-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.74