NY S08074 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - SIGNED CHAP.88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes technical corrections to a provision requiring the use of gender-neutral terms in law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes technical corrections to a provision requiring the use of gender-neutral terms in law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-13SenateSIGNED CHAP.88
2024-02-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2024-02-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-02-06Assemblypassed assembly
2024-02-06Assemblyordered to third reading cal.255
2024-02-06Assemblysubstituted for a8547
2024-02-05Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2024-02-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-02-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-01-23SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.197
2024-01-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08547 (Same As) 2024-02-06 - substituted by s8074

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback