NY S08070 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.233
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.233
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment for certain state officers and employees; makes an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relates to compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment for certain state officers and employees; makes an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.233 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.472 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a10653 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1714 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10653 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s8070