NY S08069 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-27 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-27 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for recall; provides that any state or local officer, including the governor, lieutenant governor, comptroller, attorney general and state legislators may be recalled; requires a petition for recall of a statewide officer to be signed by electors equal in number to fifteen percent of the votes case in the last election for the office with signatures in each of the twenty-seven congressional districts equal in number to five percent of the last vote for the office in the district; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides for recall; provides that any state or local officer, including the governor, lieutenant governor, comptroller, attorney general and state legislators may be recalled; requires a petition for recall of a statewide officer to be signed by electors equal in number to fifteen percent of the votes case in the last election for the office with signatures in each of the twenty-seven congressional districts equal in number to five percent of the last vote for the office in the district; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-27 | Assembly | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1849 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |