NY S08061 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - SIGNED CHAP.16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - SIGNED CHAP.16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies provisions relating to dispensing of drug adulterant testing supplies.
Title
Clarifies provisions relating to dispensing of drug adulterant testing supplies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.16 |
2024-01-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.245 |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | substituted for a8525 |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | referred to health |
2024-01-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.49 |
2024-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08525 (Same As) 2024-01-23 - substituted by s8061