NY S08060 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.384
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.384
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to leasing and licensing of property at Sampson state park and at Seneca Lake state park.
Title
Relates to leasing and licensing of property at Sampson state park and at Seneca Lake state park.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.384 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.470 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a9965a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1869 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8060A |
2018-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2018-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09965 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8060a