NY S08057 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that a spouse's right of election must be made within two years of the deceased spouse's death.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifies that a spouse's right of election must be made within two years of the deceased spouse's death.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-10-01 SIGNED CHAP.545
2010-09-20 DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2010-06-15 returned to senate
2010-06-15 passed assembly
2010-06-15 ordered to third reading rules cal.115
2010-06-15 substituted for a11255
2010-06-15 referred to judiciary
2010-06-15 DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-15 PASSED SENATE
2010-06-10 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2010-06-09 2ND REPORT CAL.
2010-06-08 1ST REPORT CAL.819
2010-06-03 REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A11255 (Same As) 2010-06-15 - substituted by s8057

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback