NY S08055 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the assault of physicians providing direct patient care; provides that assault of physicians shall be assault in the second degree, a class D felony.
Title
Relates to the assault of physicians providing direct patient care; provides that assault of physicians shall be assault in the second degree, a class D felony.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1287 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A10225 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - referred to codes