NY S08044 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - SIGNED CHAP.69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Defines the term "mass shooting" for purposes of emergency response measures and access to emergency funding as a shooting incident in which at least four people are murdered with a firearm, rifle, or shotgun.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defines the term "mass shooting" for purposes of emergency response measures and access to emergency funding as a shooting incident in which at least four people are murdered with a firearm, rifle, or shotgun.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-07SenateSIGNED CHAP.69
2024-02-07SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2024-01-29Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-29Assemblypassed assembly
2024-01-29Assemblyordered to third reading cal.285
2024-01-29Assemblysubstituted for a8569
2024-01-17Assemblyreferred to codes
2024-01-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-01-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-01-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.41
2024-01-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08569 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - substituted by s8044

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback