NY S08033 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - SIGNED CHAP.386
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - SIGNED CHAP.386
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "diaper initiative affordability for parents and elderly remedy (DIAPER) act".
Title
Establishes the "diaper initiative affordability for parents and elderly remedy (DIAPER) act".
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] |
Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-19 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.386 |
2022-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.700 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a8528a |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1657 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8033A |
2022-05-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A08528 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8033a