NY S08031 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the promotion, market and sale of New York state farm products for holiday celebrations and decorations.
Title
Relates to the promotion, market and sale of New York state farm products for holiday celebrations and decorations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1595 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A10055 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - reported referred to ways and means