NY S08027 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - PRINT NUMBER 8027B
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - PRINT NUMBER 8027B
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crime of forcible touching of a correction officer; increases criminal penalties for certain sexual offenses committed against correction officers when such correction officer is acting in the course of their employment.
Title
Establishes the crime of forcible touching of a correction officer; increases criminal penalties for certain sexual offenses committed against correction officers when such correction officer is acting in the course of their employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Anthony Palumbo [R] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8027B |
2022-05-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2022-03-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8027A |
2022-03-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2022-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08647 (Same As) 2022-06-13 - print number 8647a