NY S08026 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - SIGNED CHAP.12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the division of criminal justice services to establish a task force on missing women and girls who are black, indigenous and people of color (BIPOC).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the division of criminal justice services to establish a task force on missing women and girls who are black, indigenous and people of color (BIPOC).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-26SenateSIGNED CHAP.12
2024-01-26SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2024-01-23Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-23Assemblypassed assembly
2024-01-23Assemblyordered to third reading cal.253
2024-01-23Assemblysubstituted for a8545
2024-01-16Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2024-01-16SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-01-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-01-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.29
2024-01-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08545 (Same As) 2024-01-23 - substituted by s8026

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback