NY S08026 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the gaming inspector general.
Title
Relates to the gaming inspector general.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.838 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |