NY S08022 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8299A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8299A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association of Westbury.
Title
Relates to the Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association of Westbury.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8299A |
2022-05-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8022A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.781 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08299 (Same As) 2022-08-17 - signed chap.514