NY S08019 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Good Samaritan Hospital Medical Center, town of Islip, county of Suffolk, to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes the Good Samaritan Hospital Medical Center, town of Islip, county of Suffolk, to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.245 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.96 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a9814 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.726 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09814 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.245