NY S08015 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sentence imposed for convictions of murder in the first degree.
Title
Relates to the sentence imposed for convictions of murder in the first degree.
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] |
Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.831 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |