NY S08014 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.61
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.61
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain schools shall experience no financial harm for reduced enrollment or inability to operate for the full 180 session days due to the outbreak of coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19).
Title
Provides that certain schools shall experience no financial harm for reduced enrollment or inability to operate for the full 180 session days due to the outbreak of coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19).
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | approval memo.61 |
2020-12-23 | Senate | signed chap.363 |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1019 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8014C |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.201 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | rules report cal.201 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-14 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-03-24 | Senate | referred to education |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10193 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1019 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8014C |
2020-03-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2020-03-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8014B |
2020-03-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2020-03-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8014A |
2020-03-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2020-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10193 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - approval memo.61