NY S07993 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10275
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10275
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the reimbursement of shelter costs and crime scene cleanup for certain, non-injured victims including battered spouses and children.
Title
Relates to the reimbursement of shelter costs and crime scene cleanup for certain, non-injured victims including battered spouses and children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10275 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1376 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A10275 (Same As) 2018-08-22 - signed chap.204