NY S07981 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.280
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.280
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the village of Plandome Manor entering into contracts to sell delinquent tax liens.
Title
Relates to the village of Plandome Manor entering into contracts to sell delinquent tax liens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.280 |
2016-08-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.508 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a10604 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1947 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7981A |
2016-06-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10604 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s7981a