NY S07973 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.194
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to incorporating the Port Jefferson Volunteer Firemen's Benevolent Association, in relation to its purpose and the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to incorporating the Port Jefferson Volunteer Firemen's Benevolent Association, in relation to its purpose and the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.194
2020-09-16SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-06-10Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2020-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.107
2020-06-10Assemblysubstituted for a9997
2020-06-09Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2020-06-09SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-06-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.724
2020-06-08SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2020-03-05SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A09997 (Same As) 2020-06-10 - substituted by s7973

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback