NY S07966 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of the authorization to the county of Genesee to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes from November 30, 2020 to November 30, 2023.
Title
Extends the expiration of the authorization to the county of Genesee to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes from November 30, 2020 to November 30, 2023.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10134 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - referred to ways and means