NY S07926 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.229
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.229
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the city of Hornell, county of Steuben to accept from St. Ann's Academy an application for exemptions from real property taxes for the 2013-2014 assessment roll.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the city of Hornell, county of Steuben to accept from St. Ann's Academy an application for exemptions from real property taxes for the 2013-2014 assessment roll.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.229 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.412 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a10218 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1832 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10218 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7926