NY S07924 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the office of general services to sell certain state-owned land to the Montefiore Medical Center.
Title
Authorizes the office of general services to sell certain state-owned land to the Montefiore Medical Center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.324 |
2016-09-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.527 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a10349 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1748 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10349 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s7924