NY S07916 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the income eligibility threshold for the tuition assistance program.
Title
Increases the income eligibility threshold for the tuition assistance program.
Sponsors
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2022-05-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.872 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7916B |
2022-04-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-02-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7916A |
2022-01-31 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2022-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09180 (Same As) 2022-05-19 - print number 9180a