NY S07914 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires colleges, universities, professional, proprietary and graduate schools to provide written notice to all students of the institution's tuition liability policy.
Title
Requires colleges, universities, professional, proprietary and graduate schools to provide written notice to all students of the institution's tuition liability policy.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2022-05-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.512 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09582 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - referred to higher education