NY S07900 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the electronic appearance of a defendant in the county of Sullivan, provided that the chief administrator of the courts has authorized the use of electronic appearance and the defendant, after consultation with counsel, consents on the record.
Title
Permits the electronic appearance of a defendant in the county of Sullivan, provided that the chief administrator of the courts has authorized the use of electronic appearance and the defendant, after consultation with counsel, consents on the record.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8578 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1549 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08578 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - signed chap.254