NY S07871 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7108
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7108
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a utilization review of a request for nursing home care after an inpatient hospital admission to be completed within 24 hours of the request.
Title
Requires a utilization review of a request for nursing home care after an inpatient hospital admission to be completed within 24 hours of the request.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7108 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.982 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07108 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES