NY S07870 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.176
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.176
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the qualifications for holding the office of assistant district attorney in the county of Orleans.
Title
Relates to the qualifications for holding the office of assistant district attorney in the county of Orleans.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Senate | signed chap.176 |
2020-09-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.830 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7870A |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-09 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.100 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | rules report cal.100 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-08 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-03 | Senate | print number 9905a |
2020-06-03 | Senate | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2020-02-27 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9905A |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.830 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7870A |
2020-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09905 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - signed chap.176