NY S07868 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - PRINT NUMBER 7868C
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - PRINT NUMBER 7868C
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the constitution to convey land to Debar Pond Institute, Inc. in order to facilitate the preservation of historic buildings.
Title
Amends the constitution to convey land to Debar Pond Institute, Inc. in order to facilitate the preservation of historic buildings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7868C |
2022-06-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | AMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 7868 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7868B |
2022-04-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2022-04-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7868A |
2022-04-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2022-03-01 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-28 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2022-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07535 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES