NY S07862 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-12 - SIGNED CHAP.570
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-12 - SIGNED CHAP.570
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state agencies from assessing an additional collection fee charge on outstanding debt where the sum due and owing any state agency results from tuition, fees, room and board, educational benefit overpayments, student loans, or other charges incurred by a student in furtherance of such student's education.
Title
Prohibits state agencies from assessing an additional collection fee charge on outstanding debt where the sum due and owing any state agency results from tuition, fees, room and board, educational benefit overpayments, student loans, or other charges incurred by a student in furtherance of such student's education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-12 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.570 |
2022-10-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.745 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10261 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7862B |
2022-05-24 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-24 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-03 | Senate | AMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 7862 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-02 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 7862A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.871 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10261 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s7862b