NY S07861 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of agriculture and markets, in cooperation with NYSERDA and institutions of higher education, to develop and produce guidance and educational materials for farmers on the use of agrivoltaics in farming; requires the department of agriculture and markets to provide a booth at the state fair for the purpose of educating the general public on the use of agrivoltaics in farming.
Title
Directs the department of agriculture and markets, in cooperation with NYSERDA and institutions of higher education, to develop and produce guidance and educational materials for farmers on the use of agrivoltaics in farming; requires the department of agriculture and markets to provide a booth at the state fair for the purpose of educating the general public on the use of agrivoltaics in farming.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-22 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.27 |
2022-11-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.629 |
2022-11-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.515 |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | substituted for a9336a |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2022-03-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-24 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2022-03-21 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7861A |
2022-03-21 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-03-21 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-09 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2022-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.430 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A09336 (Same As) 2022-04-04 - substituted by s7861a