NY S07859 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.533
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to phase two of the construction projects undertaken by the Rochester joint schools construction board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to phase two of the construction projects undertaken by the Rochester joint schools construction board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.533
2014-12-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2014-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.513
2014-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a10083a
2014-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2014-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1629
2014-06-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 7859A
2014-06-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2014-06-16SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A10083 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7859a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback