NY S07850 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of the office of mental health, in consultation with the commissioner and the office of addiction services and supports to submit a report that details the resources necessary to make the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline, otherwise known as the 9-8-8 suicide prevention and mental health crisis hotline system, available, operational, and effective across the state.
Title
Directs the commissioner of the office of mental health, in consultation with the commissioner and the office of addiction services and supports to submit a report that details the resources necessary to make the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline, otherwise known as the 9-8-8 suicide prevention and mental health crisis hotline system, available, operational, and effective across the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Samra Brouk [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.135 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.307 |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | substituted for a8711 |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2022-01-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.206 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08711 (Same As) 2022-01-25 - substituted by s7850