NY S07844 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that the department of motor vehicles shall notify individuals via postal mail that their vehicle inspection is subject to expiration thirty days before such expiration; provides for a five day grace period after the expiration of the vehicle inspection certificate wherein operators of such vehicle shall not be fined.
Title
Establishes that the department of motor vehicles shall notify individuals via postal mail that their vehicle inspection is subject to expiration thirty days before such expiration; provides for a five day grace period after the expiration of the vehicle inspection certificate wherein operators of such vehicle shall not be fined.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1301 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A11238 (Same As) 2018-06-15 - referred to transportation