NY S07843 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the National September 11 Memorial & Museum will be an eligible entity for purposes of the exemption provided in chapter 696 of the laws of 1887.
Title
Provides that the National September 11 Memorial & Museum will be an eligible entity for purposes of the exemption provided in chapter 696 of the laws of 1887.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.247 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.577 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a10096 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1529 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A10096 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7843