NY S07838 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of education to report information regarding counselors, social workers and psychologists in schools and to implement a plan to increase the school counselor, school social worker and school psychologist to student ratio to nationally accepted standards and provide funding for such.
Title
Requires the department of education to report information regarding counselors, social workers and psychologists in schools and to implement a plan to increase the school counselor, school social worker and school psychologist to student ratio to nationally accepted standards and provide funding for such.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Assembly | referred to education |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-04-17 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2018-03-28 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7838A |
2018-03-28 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-28 | Senate | returned to senate |
2018-03-28 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
2018-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.554 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10387 (Same As) 2018-04-18 - referred to education