NY S07818 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - SIGNED CHAP.548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to treatment plans for certain inmates who are receiving mental health services at or prior to the time of their anticipated release date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to treatment plans for certain inmates who are receiving mental health services at or prior to the time of their anticipated release date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-29AssemblySIGNED CHAP.548
2014-12-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2014-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.428
2014-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a10071
2014-06-18Assemblyreferred to codes
2014-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1526
2014-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2014-06-11SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

Same As/Similar To

A10071 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s7818

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback